Global Patent Index - EP 2025809 A2

EP 2025809 A2 2009-02-18 - Method for influencing the two sidedness of layer orientation and headbox for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for influencing the two sidedness of layer orientation and headbox for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beeinflussung der Zweiseitigkeit der Layer Orientation und Stoffauflauf zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour influencer de la dualité de l'orientation de couche et caisse de tête destinée à l'exécution du procédé

Publication

EP 2025809 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08161250 A

Priority

DE 102007036945 A

Abstract (en)

At the flow opening (2) of a stock inlet (1), at a papermaking or cardboard production machine to produce a fiber web (3), the fiber suspension flow (9) or stream (10) is affected by guides (12,14.1,14.2) at both surfaces (13O,13U) of the flow passage to alter the turbulence and fluid friction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Beeinflussung der Zweiseitigkeit der Layer Orientation in einem in einer Stoffauflaufdüse (2) eines Stoffauflaufs (1) einer Maschine zur Herstellung einer wenigstens einschichtigen Faserstoffbahn (3), insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, als Faserstoffsuspensionsstrom (9) geführten und von der Stoffauflaufdüse (2) als Freistrahl ausgebrachten Faserstoffsuspensionsstrahl (10). Das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass der Faserstoffsuspensionsstrom (9) bzw. Faserstoffsuspensionsstrahl (10) zumindest an einer seiner beiden Oberflächen (13.0, 13.U) von wenigstens einem Mittel (12; 14.1, 14.2; 18.1, 18.2; 22) zwecks Änderung von Turbulenz und Fluidreibung beaufschlagt wird. Weiterhin betrifft die Erfindung einen Stoffauflauf (1) zur Durchführung des erfindungsgemäßen Verfahrens.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/028 (2013.01); D21F 1/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1452640 A2 20040901 - VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025809 A2 20090218; EP 2025809 A3 20121031; DE 102007036945 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130503

2013-08-22 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-07-03 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2013-07-03 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2012-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21F 1/02 20060101AFI20120921BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS