Global Patent Index - EP 2025822 A2

EP 2025822 A2 2009-02-18 - Frame construction

Title (en)

Frame construction

Title (de)

Rahmenkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Construction de cadre

Publication

EP 2025822 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013229 A

Priority

AT 12332007 A

Abstract (en)

The frame construction has profiles (1, 2) running parallel to each other and held together by u-shaped connecting parts (5) that are locked with the profiles. The profiles interlock a groove (4) and a spring (3). The connecting parts are arranged in a base of the groove, and form a stop with side walls for a wall of the groove and for the spring. Edges of the side walls of the connecting parts are attached to a step (11) that is formed by a recess (10) in the sidewall of the groove. The edges are provided with wedge-shaped bars (9) that engage in grooves (12, 13) at the spring.

Abstract (de)

Rahmenkonstruktion, insbesondere für die Wände von Bädern und Nasszellen, wobei parallel zueinander verlaufende Profile durch Verbindungsteile zusammengehalten werden, welche mit beiden Profilen verrastet sind, wobei die Profile (1, 2) mit Nut (4) und Feder (3) ineinander greifen und die im Querschnitt etwa U-förmigen Verbindungsteile (5) auf dem Grund der Nut (4) angeordnet sind und mit ihren Seitenwänden (6) einerseits für die Wände der Nut (4), andererseits für die Feder (3) Anschläge bilden.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04B 1/58 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/2403 (2013.01); E04B 1/58 (2013.01); E04B 2/744 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2475 (2013.01); E04B 2001/5881 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025822 A2 20090218; EP 2025822 A3 20110817; AT 505807 A1 20090415; AT 505807 B1 20091015

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-06-14 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120425

2012-04-25 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-08-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 1/24 20060101AFI20110713BHEP

2011-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 1/58 20060101ALI20110713BHEP

2011-08-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04B 2/74 20060101ALI20110713BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS