Global Patent Index - EP 2025823 A1

EP 2025823 A1 2009-02-18 - Large-size sandwich wall panel of fibrolite and method for fabrication thereof

Title (en)

Large-size sandwich wall panel of fibrolite and method for fabrication thereof

Title (de)

Großformatige Sandwichwandplatte aus Fibrolit und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Grand panneau mural de type sandwich en fibrolite et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 2025823 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08162217 A

Priority

RU 2007131064 A

Abstract (en)

Described in the application is a shop-prefabricated wall panel, which is intended to use as a support element for outer and inner walls in low-rise buildings construction. A large-size wall panel having width equal to the storey height is made having many parallel layers of fibrolite, altering with low and high density along the width, wherein one or more high-density fibrolite layers are disposed between the low-density layers, bearing the structural design compressive load, whilst the low-density layers of fibrolite provide thin layers of high-density fibrolite with stability under compression, bearing load of elastic deformation of entire panel, also providing heat and noise insulation. The high-density fibrolite slabs are laid with gaps between their adjacent sides in order to provide air change between the low-density layers. The panel is fabricated by compacting fibrolite pulp layer by layer and compacting each layer, wherein high-density fibrolite slabs fabricated using in-line system are placed between the layers. It is possible to fabricate the sandwich panel without high-density fibrolite slabs.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025823 A1 20090218; RU 2352734 C1 20090420

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091215

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080812

- Countries: AL

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080812

- Countries: BA

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080812

- Countries: MK

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20080812

- Countries: RS

2009-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090803

2009-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090618

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS