Global Patent Index - EP 2025826 A1

EP 2025826 A1 2009-02-18 - Notched wire made of duplex stainless steel for the reinforcement of concrete structures

Title (en)

Notched wire made of duplex stainless steel for the reinforcement of concrete structures

Title (de)

Gerippter Draht aus Duplex-Edelstahl zur Bewehrung von Betonkonstruktionen

Title (fr)

Fil cranté pour armature de structure en béton, en acier inoxydable duplex.

Publication

EP 2025826 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08160983 A

Priority

FR 0756800 A

Abstract (en)

The wire (1) has notches (3) forming locks that extends along a wire with a step (c), where the wire is made of duplex stainless steel. The steel structure comprises ferrite in the range between 30 and 70 percentages. The notching of the wire is obtained by clod plastic deformation. The maximal width at a base (Lc) of each lock is greater than 0.35 times the diameter. The step is in the range between 0.6 and 1 times the diameter. An orientation angle (beta) of the lock lies in the range between 40 and 65 degrees. An inclination angle of lock flanks lies in the range of 65-90 degrees. An independent claim is also included for a method for fabricating a notched wire.

Abstract (fr)

Fil cranté pour armature de béton comportant des rangées de verrous s'étendant le long du fil avec un pas c ‰¤ d (diamètre équivalent du fil), en forme de croissant incliné par rapport à l'axe du fil, de section trapézoïdale, de hauteur maximale a ‰¥ 0,05 d et ‰¤ 0,15 d . Au moins lorsque a ‰¤ 0,065 d , le coefficient de forme F du fil cranté, selon la formule de Simpson, est ‰¥ 0,039 si d < 7 mm ; ‰¥ 0,045 si d ‰¥ 7 mm et < 9 mm ; ‰¥ 0,052 si d ‰¥ 9 mm. Le fil est en acier inoxydable duplex comprenant de 30 % à 70 % de ferrite avec Rp 0,2 ‰¥ 500 MPa, Rm ‰¥ 1,07 Rp 0,2 et Agt > 0,05 ; le crantage est à froid ; la largeur maximale à la base Lc des verrous est ‰¥ 0,35 x d , le pas c est ‰¥ 0,6 d ; l'angle ² des verrous, par rapport à l'axe du fil, est ‰¥ 40° et ‰¤ 65° ; l'angle ± d'inclinaison des flancs des verrous est ‰¥ 65° et ‰¤ 90°.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/03 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/03 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/42 (2013.01); C22C 38/48 (2013.01); C22C 38/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025826 A1 20090218; FR 2919639 A1 20090206; FR 2919639 B1 20091113

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160119

2015-10-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150908

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090826

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS