Global Patent Index - EP 2025829 A2

EP 2025829 A2 2009-02-18 - Floor Covering

Title (en)

Floor Covering

Title (de)

Fussbodenbelag

Title (fr)

Revêtement de sol

Publication

EP 2025829 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104944 A

Priority

DE 102007036613 A

Abstract (en)

The covering (1) has multiple panels and an underlay mat (3). The panels (2) are provided with complementary profiles (4a,4b) on opposite edges. The profiles are so formed that they are locked in similar manner on the panels connected with the profiles. The profiles are provided in a direction normal to level of floor or in a direction normal to side edge and in plane of the floor. Independent claims are included for the following: (1) a method for displacing a covering (2) an underlay mat for a covering.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Belag (1) für einen Fußboden mit mehreren Paneelen (2) und mit einer Unterlagsmatte (3), der dadurch einfach herzustellen und zu verlegen ist, dass die Paneele an gegenüberliegenden Kanten komplementäre Profile (4a,4b) aufweisen, die derart ausgebildet sind, dass sie gleichartige, über diese Profile verbundene Paneele in einer Richtung normal auf die Ebene des Fußbodens oder in einer Richtung normal zur Seitenkante und in der Ebene des Fußbodens verriegeln, und dass die Unterlagsmatte derart ausgebildet ist, dass die Paneele zusätzlich durch die Unterlagsmatte in einer Richtung normal zu einer Seitenkante und in der Ebene des Fußbodens gehalten sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/02 (2006.01); E04F 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/20 (2013.01); E04F 15/02 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0107 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0138 (2013.01); E04F 2201/028 (2013.01); E04F 2201/043 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025829 A2 20090218; EP 2025829 A3 20111026; DE 102007036613 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170921

2015-07-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO. OG

2014-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140613

2012-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-10-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04F 15/02 20060101AFI20110922BHEP

2011-10-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04F 15/20 20060101ALI20110922BHEP

2011-02-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO. OG

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS