Global Patent Index - EP 2025850 A2

EP 2025850 A2 2009-02-18 - High safety hydraulic device for the operation of sectional overhead doors

Title (en)

High safety hydraulic device for the operation of sectional overhead doors

Title (de)

Hydraulische Vorrichtung mit hoher Sicherheit zur Betätigung von Deckensektionaltoren

Title (fr)

Dispositif hydraulique à haute sécurité pour l'opération de portes basculantes en sections

Publication

EP 2025850 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08425495 A

Priority

IT VI20070237 A

Abstract (en)

A high safety hydraulic device for the operation of sectional overhead doors (POR), of the type comprising at least one hydraulic cylinder (CI), connected to at least one hydraulic circuit (MI), which allows the opening or closing of the overhead door (POR), through an electro-hydraulic motor (M), suitable for operating at least one pump for the circulation of a fluid within at least one pipe (TU) of the hydraulic circuit (MI); in particular, between the hydraulic cylinder (CI) and the discharge tank (SC) placed downstream the motor (M), is provided at least one first solenoid valve (VA), normally closed, placed at the outlet of the hydraulic cylinder (CI) and preferably integral with it, and a second solenoid valve (NS), normally closed, placed between the pipe (TU) and the discharge tank (SC).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/59 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025850 A2 20090218; EP 2025850 A3 20130220; IT VI20070237 A1 20090214

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-12-12 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20131023

2013-10-23 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2013-10-23 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2013-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 15/08 20060101AFI20130116BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS