Global Patent Index - EP 2025853 A2

EP 2025853 A2 2009-02-18 - Actuator device for a gate drive, such a gate drive device and a gate

Title (en)

Actuator device for a gate drive, such a gate drive device and a gate

Title (de)

Mitnehmervorrichtung für eine Torantriebsvorrichtung, eine solche Torantriebsvorrichtung und ein Tor

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraîneur pour un dispositif d'entraînement de porte, un tel dispositif d'entraînement de porte et une porte

Publication

EP 2025853 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08159413 A

Priority

  • DE 202007009233 U
  • DE 202007014548 U

Abstract (en)

The drive carriage has first and second drive devices and a coupling for coupling and/or decoupling the drive arrangement to and from a drive unit (124). At least one guide device is suitable for guidance along a linear guide and the coupling device can be changed between locked and released positions, in each of which it can be held by a further arrangement. Independent claims are also included for the following: (A) a door drive arrangement (B) and a door.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Mitnehmervorrichtung (10) für eine Torantriebsvorrichtung (110), mit einer ersten Mitnehmereinrichtung (130, 30), einer zweiten Mitnehmereinrichtung (20, 40) und einer Kupplungseinrichtung (60) zum Koppeln und/oder Abkoppeln der Mitnehmervorrichtung (10) von einem Antriebsaggregat (124), wobei wenigstens eine der Mitnehmereinrichtungen (130, 30, 20, 40) zur linearen Führung entlang einer Führungseinrichtung (120) geeignet ist, und wobei die Kupplungseinrichtung (60) von einer Verriegelungsstellung in eine Entriegelungsstellung und umgekehrt derart schaltbar ist, dass in der Entriegelungsstellung die erste Mitnehmereinrichtung (130, 30) und die zweite Mitnehmereinrichtung (20, 40) entkoppelt und in der Verriegelungsstellung die erste Mitnehmereinrichtung (130, 30) mit der zweiten Mitnehmereinrichtung (20, 40) gekoppelt ist und wobei ein Mittel zum Halten der Kupplungseinrichtung (60) in der Entriegelungsstellung und zum Halten der Kupplungseinrichtung (60) in der Verriegelungsstellung vorgesehen ist. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung eine Torantriebsvorrichtung und ein Tor mit einer solchen Mitnehmervorrichtung (10).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/668 (2015.01); E05F 15/681 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/681 (2013.01); E05F 15/668 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/214 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/244 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 202005009012 U1 20061019 - HOERMANN KG ANTRIEBSTECHNIK [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007014548 U1 20081113; EP 2025853 A2 20090218; EP 2025853 A3 20090429; EP 2025853 B1 20170830; EP 2025853 B8 20171011

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180531

2018-05-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008015570

2017-10-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008015570

2017-09-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HOERMANN KG ANTRIEBSTECHNIK

2017-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2017-03-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170216

2017-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 15/681 20150101ALI20170126BHEP

2017-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 15/668 20150101AFI20170126BHEP

2017-01-26 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502008015570

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: E05F0015160000

- IPC: E05F0015668000

2010-03-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100204

2010-02-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2010-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091028

2010-01-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT

2010-01-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS