Global Patent Index - EP 2025854 A2

EP 2025854 A2 2009-02-18 - Flush closing sliding door arranged in a pocket in the wall

Title (en)

Flush closing sliding door arranged in a pocket in the wall

Title (de)

Bündig schliessende, in einer Wandaussparung angeordnete Schiebetür

Title (fr)

Porte coulissante coplanaire agencée dans une cavité murale

Publication

EP 2025854 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08161360 A

Priority

IT MI20071572 A

Abstract (en)

Sliding door (10) for a fixed structure (13) provided with at least one opening (14). In the fixed structure (13) two panels (11) are foreseen that can slide between a first open position and a second closed position of the opening (14). Each of the panels (11) is provided with at least one sliding and guide element (22a,22b). The sliding and guide elements (22a,22b) are forced to slide inside rails (23,24) consisting of a first linear portion (23a,24a) parallel to the main extension of the fixed structure (13) and a second curved portion (23b,24b).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/46 (2006.01); E05D 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/4654 (2013.01); E06B 3/4645 (2013.01); E05D 2015/1031 (2013.01); E05D 2015/1055 (2013.01); E05F 17/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/14 (2013.01); E06B 3/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025854 A2 20090218; EP 2025854 A3 20110720; IT MI20071572 A1 20090201

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130914

2013-05-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130503

2012-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-05-16 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-03-28 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-07-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-07-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 3/46 20060101AFI20081029BHEP

2011-07-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05D 15/10 20060101ALI20110616BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS