Global Patent Index - EP 2025861 A2

EP 2025861 A2 2009-02-18 - Remote actuation of downhole tools using fluid pressure from surface

Title (en)

Remote actuation of downhole tools using fluid pressure from surface

Title (de)

Fernbetätigung von Bohrwerkzeugen mit Flüssigdruck von der Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Actionnement à distance d'outils de forage utilisant une pression de fluide en surface

Publication

EP 2025861 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08252136 A

Priority

GB 0715970 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for and a method of transmitting signals from the surface of a well to a location downhole in the well utilize a downhole fluid pressure sensor (52), a signal processing means (54; 56; 58) located downhole in electrical connection with the pressure sensor (52) and a downhole programmable logic unit (60) capable of counting at least two signals received by the downhole pressure sensor (52). Typically, signals transmitted from the surface comprise a peak in pressure of downhole fluid located in production tubing run into a well bore and these signals are sensed by the downhole fluid pressure sensor (52). The logic unit (60) outputs a signal to a tool to be actuated if it receives a number of signals within a particular time period, wherein the logic unit (60) actuates the tool by the frequency of signals received rather than the amplitude of the signals received.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 34/10 (2006.01); E21B 47/18 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/18 (2013.01); E21B 34/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025861 A2 20090218; EP 2025861 A3 20101006; AU 2008202761 A1 20090305; BR PI0803502 A2 20091006; CA 2635306 A1 20090216; GB 0715970 D0 20070926; US 2009044937 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110407

2011-07-14 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-06-15 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS