Global Patent Index - EP 2025880 A2

EP 2025880 A2 2009-02-18 - Exhaust gas turbocharger for a combustion engine

Title (en)

Exhaust gas turbocharger for a combustion engine

Title (de)

Abgasturbolader für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Turbocompresseur pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 2025880 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08162168 A

Priority

AT 12852007 A

Abstract (en)

The turbocharger (2) has an exhaust gas turbine (1) and a compressor. The exhaust gas turbine has two groups of guide vanes. Guide vane channels are provided whose channel cross-sections are changed by a gate valve (8) and have larger radial components as guide vanes whose guide vane channel cross sections are changed. The gate valve has multiple runners distributed evenly over the area.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Abgasturbolader (2) für eine Brennkraftmaschine, mit einer Abgasturbine (1) und einem Verdichter, sowie mit einem stromaufwärts des Laufrades (4, 40) der Abgasturbine (1) im Gehäuse (3) axial verschiebbar angeordneten Sperrschieber (8) zur Steuerung des Durchflusses, wobei der Sperrschieber (8) Ausnehmungen (8a) für Leitschaufeln (7a) der Abgasturbine (1) aufweist, wobei zumindest eine Gruppe von Leitschaufeln (7a) in zumindest einer Sperrstellung des Sperrschiebers (8) abgedeckt ist. Um in jedem Motorbetriebsbereich einen optimalen Wirkungsgrad zu ermöglichen, ist vorgesehen, dass der Sperrschieber (8) zumindest einen Strömungskanal aufweist, dessen Querschnitt unabhängig von der Stellung des Sperrschiebers (8) eine Strömungsverbindung zwischen einer Eintrittsspirale (5) und dem Laufrad (4, 40) herstellt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/14 (2006.01); F01D 5/04 (2006.01); F01D 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/048 (2013.01); F01D 17/143 (2013.01); F02B 37/22 (2013.01); F05D 2220/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

AT 505407 A4 20090115; AT 505407 B1 20090115; EP 2025880 A2 20090218; EP 2025880 A3 20091230

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-09-08 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2009-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-12-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 17/14 20060101AFI20081211BHEP

2009-12-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 17/16 20060101ALI20091120BHEP

2009-12-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 5/04 20060101ALI20091120BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS