Global Patent Index - EP 2025885 A2

EP 2025885 A2 2009-02-18 - Oil control valve for variable cam phaser

Title (en)

Oil control valve for variable cam phaser

Title (de)

Ölsteuerungsventil für einen regelbaren Nockenwellenversteller

Title (fr)

Soupape de contrôle d'huile pour déphaseur à came variable

Publication

EP 2025885 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08161391 A

Priority

US 89108007 A

Abstract (en)

An oil control valve for a variable cam phaser (14) has a secure steel-to-steel fit between the secondary plate (62) of the bobbin (42) and the frame (52) owing to a shoulder (58) formed in the frame (52) against which the secondary plate (62) abuts, and also owing to an o-ring (64) disposed between the bobbin (42) and frame (52). This prevents oil from leaking into the electrical connector (46) of the valve, which advantageously can be oriented parallel to the axis of the valve.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/344 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01); F16K 27/02 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/3442 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34426 (2013.01); F01L 2001/3443 (2013.01); H01F 7/128 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025885 A2 20090218; EP 2025885 A3 20090415; US 2009038571 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091016

2010-02-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS