Global Patent Index - EP 2025914 A1

EP 2025914 A1 2009-02-18 - Method of filtering exhaust gases recirculated from an internal combustion engine and engine using such a method.

Title (en)

Method of filtering exhaust gases recirculated from an internal combustion engine and engine using such a method.

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Filterung von rückgeführten Abgasen eines Kraftfahrzeug-Verbrennungsmotors und Motor, bei dem ein solches Verfahren zum Einsatz kommt

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la filtration des gaz d'échappement recirculés d'un moteur à combustion interne et moteur utilisant un tel procédé.

Publication

EP 2025914 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08290634 A

Priority

FR 0705169 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves traversing a particle filter (32) by a part of an exhaust gas (G) in a circulation direction inverse to a regular direction for regeneration of the particle filter. The traversing of the filter is carried out by positioning an exhaust gas recirculation valve (34) in a closing position, and by directing the exhaust gas from an exhaust manifold (22) and from an exhaust line (24) towards an intake manifold (18) and a fresh air intake conduit (40). An independent claim is also included for an internal combustion engine comprising a circulation conduit.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un procédé pour la filtration de gaz d'échappement recirculés d'un moteur à combustion interne, notamment de type Diesel, comportant un circuit de circulation pour des gaz d'échappement recirculés (12) allant de l'échappement (22, 24) de ce moteur vers son admission (18, 20), ledit circuit comprenant une conduite de circulation (26) avec des moyens de vannage (34, 52) pour contrôler la circulation des gaz recirculés dans le circuit et un filtre (32) en amont desdits moyens de vannage pour capter les particules contenues dans les gaz recirculés lorsque ceux-ci traversent ledit filtre dans un sens de circulation conventionnel allant de l'échappement (22, 24) vers l'admission (18, 20). Selon l'invention, le procédé consiste, pour la régénération du filtre à particules (32), à faire traverser ledit filtre par au moins une partie des gaz d'échappement dans un sens de circulation inverse au sens conventionnel.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0233 (2013.01); F02M 26/35 (2016.02); F02M 26/44 (2016.02); F02M 26/16 (2016.02); F02M 26/28 (2016.02); F02M 26/71 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025914 A1 20090218; FR 2919027 A1 20090123; FR 2919027 B1 20130517

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150106

2010-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090910

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS