Global Patent Index - EP 2025922 A2

EP 2025922 A2 2009-02-18 - Fuel injector valve for combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel injector valve for combustion engines

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de carburant pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 2025922 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104675 A

Priority

DE 102007037825 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel injection valve (10) has a valve needle (14), which controls an injection opening by its longitudinal movement. The pressure of a control chamber (16) acts directly on the valve needle, which is connected with leakage oil chamber (20) through a discharge channel (18). An intermediate element is arranged between an actuator (30) and guidance (24) such that a mechanical suppression force, which acts on the actuator, is inducted into the guidance through the intermediate element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (10) für Brennkraftmaschinen, mit einer Ventilnadel (14), die durch ihre Längsbewegung die Öffnung wenigstens einer Einspritzöffnung steuert, und mit einem Steuerraum (16), dessen Druck wenigstens mittelbar auf die Ventilnadel (14) wirkt, und der durch einen Ablaufkanal (18) mit einem Leckölraum (20) verbindbar ist, und mit einem Steuerventil (22), das zum Öffnen und Verschließen des Ablaufkanals (18) ausgebildet ist, wobei das Steuerventil (22) ein auf einem Führungselement (24) verlagerbar gehaltenes Stellelement (26) aufweist, das in Richtung auf einen Dichtsitz (28) mit einer Kraft beaufschlagt ist, und mit einem Aktuator (30) zum Abheben des Stellelements (26) von dem Dichtsitz (28). Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass zwischen dem Aktuator (30) und dem Führungselement (24) ein Zwischenelement (44) so angeordnet ist, dass eine mechanische Niederhaltekraft, die auf den Aktuator (30) wirkt, über das Zwischenelement (44) in das Führungselement (24) eingeleitet wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/004 (2013.01); F02M 63/007 (2013.01); F02M 63/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025922 A2 20090218; EP 2025922 A3 20090401; EP 2025922 B1 20101222; DE 102007037825 A1 20090212; DE 502008002050 D1 20110203

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-01-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008002050

- Effective date: 20110923

2011-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110923

2011-02-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008002050

- Effective date: 20110203

2011-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502008002050 P 20110203

2010-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-12-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091028

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS