Global Patent Index - EP 2025923 A1

EP 2025923 A1 2009-02-18 - Method for determining a set of a valve needle and a valve seat assembly of an injection valve

Title (en)

Method for determining a set of a valve needle and a valve seat assembly of an injection valve

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Zusammenstellung einer Ventilnadel und einer Ventilsitzanordnung eines Einspritzventils

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer un jeu composé par une aiguille de vanne et par un assemblage de siège d'un injecteur

Publication

EP 2025923 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07015380 A

Priority

EP 07015380 A

Abstract (en)

The method is carried out with a valve assembly shell (56) comprising a valve body (4) with a cavity (8) having a fluid inlet portion (42) and a fluid outlet portion (44), and a valve seat assembly (32) with a seat plate (26) and a guiding element (28) for guiding the valve needle (10). The valve needle (10) is axially movable in the cavity (24), the valve needle (10) prevents a fluid flow through the fluid outlet portion (44) in a closing position and releases the fluid flow through the fluid outlet portion (44) in further positions, and the valve needle (10) and the valve seat assembly (32) are designed to enable a fluid flow between the fluid inlet portion (42) and the fluid outlet portion (44) following a first flow path (66) through a gap (74) between the valve needle (10) and the guiding element (28) and a second flow path (68) through the valve seat assembly (32).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/001 (2013.01); F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 61/12 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01); F02M 2200/8092 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025923 A1 20090218; EP 2025923 B1 20110413; DE 602007013891 D1 20110526

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-05-10 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007013891

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120116

2011-05-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007013891

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-05-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007013891 P 20110526

2011-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS