Global Patent Index - EP 2025924 A2

EP 2025924 A2 2009-02-18 - Valve element and method for its production

Title (en)

Valve element and method for its production

Title (de)

Ventilelement und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément d'aération et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 2025924 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104759 A

Priority

DE 102007037219 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a sealing surface (27) placed for sealing a fluid flow against a sealing surface (11) e.g. valve seat, of a valve element. One of the sealing surfaces is coated with a coating (21) made of a shape memory alloy. The sealing surfaces are designed as a flat seal. The sealing surface (27) is formed at a closing element (23) of the valve element. The closing element is formed spherical or conically. The shape memory alloy provides a reversible deformation after an effect of an external force. An independent claim is also included for a method for manufacturing a device for sealing a fluid flow.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Ventilelement zum Verschließen oder Freigeben eines Fluidstroms unter hohem Druck, umfassend ein Schließelement und ein Ventilsitz (11), wobei das Schließelement zum Verschließen in den Ventilsitz (11) gestellt wird. Der Ventilsitz (11) ist mit einer Beschichtung aus einer Formgedächtnislegierung beschichtet. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Ventilelementes sowie die Verwendung eines Ventilelementes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F16K 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/166 (2013.01); F02M 61/1886 (2013.01); F02M 2200/8053 (2013.01); F02M 2200/9015 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 102004040760 A1 20050414 - HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025924 A2 20090218; EP 2025924 A3 20090513; DE 102007037219 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-05-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091114

2010-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS