Global Patent Index - EP 2025941 A2

EP 2025941 A2 2009-02-18 - Portable vacuum creation device

Title (en)

Portable vacuum creation device

Title (de)

Tragbare Vakuumerzeugervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif portatif pour créer le vide

Publication

EP 2025941 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08012469 A

Priority

DE 102007037334 A

Abstract (en)

The device (14) has a vacuum pump (17) for producing vacuum and having a power supply terminal for connecting with a work-piece holder (11) that has a drawing head (13) for drawing a workpiece, and a transporting container (18) that is closed by a cover (20). The vacuum pump is arranged in the transporting container, and a package insert (21) packages and holds the vacuum pump in the transporting container. The package insert lies at a side wall (22) of the container. The package insert has an outer contour, which correlates with an inner contour of the container.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine tragbare Vakuumerzeugervorrichtung (14) für eine Vakuumhaltevorrichtung (10) zum Halten eines Werkstückes mittels Vakuum vorgesehen, mit einer Vakuumpumpe (17) zum Erzeugen eines Vakuums, mit einem Versorgungsanschluss zur Verbindung mit einem einen Saugkopf (13) zum Ansaugen des Werkstücks aufweisenden Werkstück-Halter (11), mit einem durch einen Deckel (20) verschließbaren Transportbehälter (18), in dem die Vakuumpumpe (17) angeordnet ist, und mit einem Kapseleinsatz (21) zum Kapseln und Halten der Vakuumpumpe (17) in dem Transportbehälter (18), wobei der Kapseleinsatz (21) an mindestens einer Wandung (22, 191, 195, 196) des Transportbehälters (18) anliegt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 23/00 (2006.01); B25B 11/00 (2006.01); F04B 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 11/005 (2013.01); B25B 11/007 (2013.01); F04B 35/06 (2013.01); F04B 37/14 (2013.01); F04C 23/00 (2013.01); F04C 2220/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025941 A2 20090218; EP 2025941 A3 20140903; EP 2025941 B1 20180124; DE 102007037334 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008015870

2018-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2018-01-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-10-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170908

2015-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2015-05-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2015-05-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2015-05-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2015-05-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2015-03-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-03-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FESTOOL GMBH

2014-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-09-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2014-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25B 11/00 20060101ALI20140725BHEP

2014-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 35/06 20060101ALI20140725BHEP

2014-09-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 23/00 20060101AFI20140725BHEP

2012-12-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FESTOOL GROUP GMBH & CO. KG

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS