Global Patent Index - EP 2025942 A2

EP 2025942 A2 2009-02-18 - Submersible multistage pump with impellers having diverging shrouds

Title (en)

Submersible multistage pump with impellers having diverging shrouds

Title (de)

Mehrstufen-Tauchpumpe mit Pumpenrädern mit divergierenden Deckbändern

Title (fr)

Pompe submersible à phases multiples avec des turbines disposant des flasques divergentes

Publication

EP 2025942 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08161663 A

Priority

US 95338607 P

Abstract (en)

A centrifugal pump may include plural pump stages (300), each comprising an impeller assembly (304), a stationary disc assembly (306) and a diffuser assembly (302), all disposed about an impeller shaft (102) that is driven by a motor. The impeller assembly (304) may include upper and lower impeller shrouds (338,334) having facing surfaces, and a plurality of impeller vanes (344) extending between the surfaces of the shrouds (338,334) to define a plurality of flow passages (346) for liquid to flow outwardly from a central hub (340) of the impeller assembly (304). To assist in pressure recovery of the pump, the distance between the surfaces of the impeller shrouds (338,334) may increase as the radial distance from the central hub (340) increases.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 1/06 (2006.01); F04D 13/08 (2006.01); F04D 29/22 (2006.01); F04D 29/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 1/063 (2013.01); F04D 13/08 (2013.01); F04D 29/2255 (2013.01); F04D 29/448 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025942 A2 20090218; EP 2025942 A3 20100818; US 2009047119 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110219

2011-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2011-06-09 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-04-27 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2010-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 1/06 20060101AFI20081009BHEP

2010-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 13/08 20060101ALI20100715BHEP

2010-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/22 20060101ALI20100715BHEP

2010-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/44 20060101ALI20100715BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS