Global Patent Index - EP 2025945 A2

EP 2025945 A2 2009-02-18 - Flow working machine with ring canal wall fitting

Title (en)

Flow working machine with ring canal wall fitting

Title (de)

Strömungsarbeitsmaschine mit Ringkanalwandausnehmung

Title (fr)

Machine de traitement des écoulements dotée d'un creux de paroi de canal de ceinture

Publication

EP 2025945 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013782 A

Priority

DE 102007037924 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has an annular recess (5) arranged in a ring channel wall of a housing and/or a shaft (2). A limiting point of the recess comprises a distance from a front blade tip point, and all distances parallel to lines connecting the front blade tip point and a rear blade tip point are measured. Other two points define characteristics of the wall of the recess at a distance of 0.75 lengths and 0.25 lengths from the front blade tip point. A connection line with another connection line encloses an angle of minus 15 degrees to 30 degrees.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Strömungsarbeitsmaschine mit einem von einem Gehäuse (1) und einer rotierenden Welle (2) gebildeten Strömungspfad, in welchem Reihen von Rotorschaufeln (3) und Statorschaufeln (4) angeordnet sind, wobei in einem Spitzenbereich der Schaufeln (3, 4) in einer Ringkanalwandung des Gehäuses (1) und/oder der Welle (2) zumindest eine ringnutartige Ausnehmung (5) angeordnet ist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass der Querschnitt und die Lage der Ausnehmung (5) wie folgt definiert sind: ein in Strömungsrichtung stromauf angeordneter Begrenzungspunkt (E) der Ausnehmung (5) weist einen Abstand e > 0 vor dem vorderen Schaufelspitzenpunkt (A) auf, ein in Strömungsrichtung stromab angeordneter Begrenzungspunkt (F) der Ausnehmung (5) weist einen Abstand (f) zu dem vorderen Schaufelspitzenpunkt (A) auf, wobei folgendes gilt: 0,5 L > f > 0, wobei L als Abstand der Schaufelspitzenpunkte (A und B) definiert ist; wobei die Wandung der Ausnehmung (5) einen Punkt (S) einschließt, welcher auf einer orthogonalen auf der Linie (AB) durch den Punkt (S) angeordnet ist, wobei eine Gerade durch die Schaufelspitzenpunkte (A und B) und eine Tangente an die Wandung der Ausnehmung (5) mindestens in einem Punkt der in einem Meridianschnitt gegebenen Wandung der Ausnehmung (5) zwischen den Punkten (S) und (F) einen Winkel (beta) einschließen, der 15° ‰¤ beta ‰¤ 70° beträgt, wobei alle Punkte in einer Meridianebene liegen, die durch eine Achsrichtung (x) der Achse (6) der Strömungsarbeitsmaschine und eine Radialrichtung (r) gebildet wird, und wobei alle Abstände parallel zu einer einen vorderen Schaufelspitzenpunkt (A) und einen hinteren Schaufelspitzenpunkt (B) verbindenden Linie gemessen sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/52 (2006.01); F04D 29/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/526 (2013.01); F04D 29/685 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025945 A2 20090218; EP 2025945 A3 20140625; EP 2025945 B1 20160420; DE 102007037924 A1 20090212; US 2009041576 A1 20090212; US 8419355 B2 20130416

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170123

2017-01-23 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008014108

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-06-02 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008014108

2016-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2016-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-12-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151113

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/52 20060101AFI20150929BHEP

2015-11-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/68 20060101ALI20150929BHEP

2015-09-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502008014108

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F04D0027020000

- IPC: F04D0029520000

2015-03-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150216

2015-03-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2015-03-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2015-03-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2015-03-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2015-03-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2014-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140716

2014-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2014-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/52 20060101ALI20140520BHEP

2014-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/66 20060101ALI20140520BHEP

2014-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/16 20060101ALI20140520BHEP

2014-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 27/02 20060101AFI20140520BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS