Global Patent Index - EP 2025946 A2

EP 2025946 A2 2009-02-18 - Rotor shroud with blocking stream production

Title (en)

Rotor shroud with blocking stream production

Title (de)

Schaufeldeckband mit Sperrstrahlerzeugung

Title (fr)

Bande de recouvrement dotée d'une production de rayons de blocage

Publication

EP 2025946 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014018 A

Priority

DE 102007037855 A

Abstract (en)

The flow machine has a main flow path with a row of blades (1) in it and a cover band (2) in a recess (3). The band group includes at least one interior chamber (7) which can be supplied with fluid , and is connected via an outlet (8) at one side of it to the main flow path round the blades, or to the cavity (9) round the cover band.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Strömungsarbeitsmaschine mit einem Hauptströmungspfad, in welchem zumindest eine Reihe von Schaufeln (1) angeordnet ist, sowie mit einem Deckband (2), welches in eine Ausnehmung (3) eines Bauteils eingebettet ist, wobei das Bauteil und die Schaufeln (1) eine rotierende Relativbewegung zueinander ausführen, wobei die das Deckband bildende Baugruppe mindestens eine Innenkammer (7) aufweist, die mindestens eine Innenkammer (7) aus einer Quelle mit Fluid versorgbar ist, die mindestens eine Innenkammer (7) über mindestens einen Auslass (8) mit dem die Schaufeln (1) umgebenden Hauptströmungspfad oder der das Deckband (2) umgebenden Kavität (9) verbunden ist, der mindestens eine Auslass (8) an einer Seite des Deckbands (2) angeordnet ist, und die Form des Auslasses (8) und die Form der Auslassöffnung so beschaffen sind, dass vom Auslass (8) ein Fluidsperrstrahl ausgeht, der eine Rezirkulation von Fluid durch die Deckbandkavität (9) unterbindet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/16 (2006.01); F01D 9/06 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01); F01D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/164 (2013.01); F01D 9/065 (2013.01); F01D 11/001 (2013.01); F01D 11/04 (2013.01); F04D 27/0238 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025946 A2 20090218; EP 2025946 A3 20130731; EP 2025946 B1 20140618; DE 102007037855 A1 20090212; US 2009047120 A1 20090219; US 8403630 B2 20130326

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-05-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150319

2015-03-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008011888

2014-07-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008011888

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2014-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2014-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2014-03-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/16 20060101AFI20140131BHEP

2014-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 11/04 20060101ALI20140131BHEP

2014-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 11/00 20060101ALI20140131BHEP

2014-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 9/06 20060101ALI20140131BHEP

2013-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130826

2013-10-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 11/00 20060101ALI20130625BHEP

2013-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 29/16 20060101AFI20130625BHEP

2013-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 9/06 20060101ALI20130625BHEP

2013-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01D 11/04 20060101ALI20130625BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS