Global Patent Index - EP 2025948 A2

EP 2025948 A2 2009-02-18 - Hydraulic control device

Title (en)

Hydraulic control device

Title (de)

Hydraulische Steueranordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de commande hydraulique

Publication

EP 2025948 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013096 A

Priority

  • DE 102007038707 A
  • DE 102007039770 A
  • DE 102007045802 A

Abstract (en)

The hydraulic control unit controls at least two consumers via an adjustable pump (4) After the pump, there is an input pressure sensing unit (IPSU) (5) under consumer pressure in the closing direction. The IPSU is sprung to block the connection between at least one consumer and the tank (6). It is also able to be moved to position in which it can control a throttled connection to the tank.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine hydraulische Steueranordnung zur Ansteuerung von zumindest einem Verbraucher, der über eine Pumpe (4) mit einstellbarer Fördermenge mit Druckmittel versorgbar ist. Im Druckmittelströmungspfad zwischen der Pumpe (4) und zumindest einem der Verbraucher (10,12) ist eine Eingangsdruckwaageneinheit (5) vorgesehen, über die eine Verbindung zu einem Tank (6) aufsteuerbar ist. Ein Power-Beyond-Anschluss (64) zum Anschließen des Power-Beyond-Verbrauchers (66) zweigt von einem Druckmittelströmungspfad zwischen der Pumpe (4) und der Eingangsdruckwaageneinheit (5) ab. Die Eingangsdruckwaageneinheit wird in Schließrichtung von einem der Lastdrücke der Verbraucher (10,12) oder eines Power-Beyond-Verbrauchers (66) beaufschlagt. Bei der Eingangsdruckwaageneinheit (5) ist in einer federvorgespannten Stellung die Verbindung zu den Verbrauchern abgesperrt, in einer anderen Stellung eine Verbindung zu dem Tank (6) und in einer weiteren Stellung eine gedrosselte Verbindung zum Tank (6) aufgesteuert.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/16 (2006.01); E02F 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/162 (2013.01); E02F 9/2207 (2013.01); E02F 9/2296 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20553 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3053 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30535 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3111 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/329 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40507 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50563 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5151 (2013.01); F15B 2211/522 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6313 (2013.01); F15B 2211/634 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6346 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6355 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6652 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6658 (2013.01); F15B 2211/781 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025948 A2 20090218; EP 2025948 A3 20130327

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140520

2014-01-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140109

2013-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130927

2013-11-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E02F 9/22 20060101ALI20130221BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F15B 11/16 20060101AFI20130221BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS