Global Patent Index - EP 2025949 A2

EP 2025949 A2 2009-02-18 - Valve module

Title (en)

Valve module

Title (de)

Ventilmodul

Title (fr)

Module de robinet

Publication

EP 2025949 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08012568 A

Priority

DE 102007038611 A

Abstract (en)

The module (13a) has a supply port (24) supplying fluid, and a fluidic pneumatic valve (38) e.g. 5/3 control valve, controllable by a control interface (36) e.g. optical interface. The valve controls fluidic tools (12a) with the supplied fluid by working ports (20a, 21a). A switching output (52a) e.g. grid-bound optical switching output, is integrated in housing (26), and outputs a switching signal (54) i.e. fail-safe switching signal, for switching a switching device (49a) to deactivate the fluidic tools.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein fluidtechnisches Ventilmodul (13a) mit einem Versorgungsanschluss (24) zur Einspeisung von Fluid, und mit mindestens einem fluidtechnischen, insbesondere pneumatischen, über eine Steuerschnittstelle (36) des Ventilmoduls (13a) steuerbaren Ventil (38) zur Ansteuerung eines fluidtechnischen Arbeitsgeräts (12a) über Arbeitsanschlüsse (20a, 21a) anhand des eingespeisten Fluids. Bei dem Ventilmodul (13a) ist vorgesehen, dass es mindestens einen in sein Gehäuse (26) integrierten Schaltausgang (52a) zur Ausgabe eines Schaltsignals (54) zum Schalten einer Schalteinrichtung (49a) zum Beeinflussen, insbesondere Deaktivieren, des Arbeitsgeräts (12a) aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0839 (2013.01); F15B 13/086 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025949 A2 20090218; EP 2025949 A3 20120808; EP 2025949 B1 20131002; CN 101368582 A 20090218; CN 101368582 B 20130605; DE 102007038611 A1 20090219; US 2009045361 A1 20090219; US 8266902 B2 20120918

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160711

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160711

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2014-10-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010745

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140703

2014-07-03 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010745

2013-11-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008010745

- Effective date: 20131128

2013-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2013-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-07-10 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-04-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2013-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130128

2012-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F15B 13/08 20060101AFI20120629BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS