Global Patent Index - EP 2025951 A2

EP 2025951 A2 2009-02-18 - Piston/cylinder-unit

Title (en)

Piston/cylinder-unit

Title (de)

Kolben/Zylinder-Einheit

Title (fr)

Unité de cylindre-piston

Publication

EP 2025951 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08162038 A

Priority

DE 102007037760 A

Abstract (en)

Piston/cylinder unit (1) comprises a securing element (20) extending in the direction of an axis (9) and preventing loosening of the piston (7). The securing element is screwed with a thread (24, 27). The thread (15, 23) between the piston and the piston rod (18) and the thread between the securing element and the piston rod work in opposing directions. Preferred Features: The piston has an axially acting stop surface (12) and the securing element has an axially acting counter stop surface (29).

Abstract (de)

Eine Kolben/Zylinder-Einheit (1) weist ein Zylindergehäuse (2), einen eine Durchbrechung (13) aufweisenden Kolben (7) und eine eine Achse (9) aufweisende Kolbenstange (18) auf. Der Kolben (7) ist über ein in der Durchbrechung (13) angeordnetes Innengewinde (15) mit einem auf einem Fortsatz (21) der Kolbenstange (18) vorgesehenen Außengewinde (23) ohne erhöhtes Anziehdrehmoment verbunden. Ein axial wirkendes Sicherungselement (20), das sich im Wesentlichen in Richtung der Achse (9) erstreckt, verhindert das Losdrehen des Kolbens (7), wobei das Sicherungselement (20) ein Gewinde (24) aufweist und mit diesem mit einem zweiten Gewinde (27) der Kolbenstange (18) verbunden ist. Die Gewindepaarung (15/23) zwischen dem Kolben (7) und der Kolbenstange (18) und die Gewindepaarung (24/27) zwischen dem Sicherungselement (20) und der Kolbenstange (18) sind dafür gegenläufig ausgebildet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/1447 (2013.01); Y10T 403/56 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025951 A2 20090218; EP 2025951 A3 20110601; DE 102007037760 A1 20090212; DE 102007037760 B4 20160324; US 2009038472 A1 20090212; US 8122812 B2 20120228

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111202

2012-03-29 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-02-08 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-06-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-05-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PACOMA GMBH

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS