Global Patent Index - EP 2025997 A1

EP 2025997 A1 2009-02-18 - Assembly and lighting device for components of shop furnishings

Title (en)

Assembly and lighting device for components of shop furnishings

Title (de)

Montage- und Beleuchtungsvorrichtung für Bauteile von Ladenmöbel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage et d'éclairage d'agencement de magasins

Publication

EP 2025997 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07425523 A

Priority

EP 07425523 A

Abstract (en)

An assembling and lighting device for components of shop furnishings, comprising a cylindrical body (13) provided with a spring locking device (17) and able to be fastened to an upright (10a, 10b) of a support structure, and an end member (15), which can be fastened to an arm (11a, 11b) of the support structure and is intended to be snap-engaged with the spring locking device (17). The end member (15) also has, associated with it, a conductor means (28) able to establish an electrical connection between an electrical power supply unit (40) and a lighting unit (50) for the furnishing components, when the end member (15) engages with the spring locking device (17).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/06 (2006.01); A47F 11/10 (2006.01); F21Y 101/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 11/10 (2013.01); F21V 23/06 (2013.01); F21V 27/00 (2013.01); F21V 33/0012 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025997 A1 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1128322

2010-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-10-23 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1128322

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090908

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090810

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS