Global Patent Index - EP 2026002 A1

EP 2026002 A1 2009-02-18 - Multi-point injector for turbomachine

Title (en)

Multi-point injector for turbomachine

Title (de)

Mehrpunkt-Einspritzer für Turbotriebwerk

Title (fr)

Injecteur multipoint pour turbomachine

Publication

EP 2026002 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08161242 A

Priority

FR 0757025 A

Abstract (en)

The injector has two shells (34, 35) with bodies encased relative to each other such that internal openings and external diameters of the bodies mutually and partially overlap by defining a hollow volume. The volume comprises three concentric baffles (360-362) that are continuous and communicated with distinct controlled circulation channels. The baffles (361, 362) are opened into a fuel intake chamber (37) placed in a zone for supply of fuel and homogenous cooling of the injector, where the zone is diametrically opposite to the channels and communicated with a metering jet. An independent claim is also included for a method for manufacturing a multipoint type fuel injector.

Abstract (fr)

Injecteur multipoint (3) pour turbomachine selon lequel tout risque de cokéfaction du carburant est éliminé. Selon l'invention, on réalise un refroidissement homogène du carburant multipoint susceptible de stagner à l'intérieur de son circuit, grâce à la réalisation de chicanes (360, 361, 362) continues qui communiquent chacune avec au moins un canal de circulation distinct (342p, 342m), et dont les chicanes périphériques (361, 362) débouchent dans une chambre d'admission (37) du carburant disposée dans une zone diamétralement opposée aux canaux de circulation (342p, 342m) et qui communique avec le gicleur (32) de carburant pilote, afin d'obtenir une alimentation et un refroidissement homogènes de l'injecteur.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/36 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/283 (2013.01); F23D 11/36 (2013.01); F23R 3/343 (2013.01); F23D 2900/00016 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49412 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49419 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026002 A1 20090218; EP 2026002 B1 20160720; CA 2638814 A1 20090210; CA 2638814 C 20151103; FR 2919898 A1 20090213; FR 2919898 B1 20140822; JP 2009041903 A 20090226; JP 5165495 B2 20130321; RU 2008132887 A 20100220; RU 2477808 C2 20130320; US 2009038312 A1 20090212; US 2012186083 A1 20120726; US 8186163 B2 20120529; US 8959772 B2 20150224

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SNECMA, FR

- Effective date: 20170713

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170421

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-04-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008045171

2016-10-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2016-09-01 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008045171

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2016-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2016-03-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160212

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2009-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090306

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS