Global Patent Index - EP 2026012 A2

EP 2026012 A2 2009-02-18 - Household device with cover

Title (en)

Household device with cover

Title (de)

Haushaltsgerät mit Abdeckung

Title (fr)

Appareil ménager doté d'un recouvrement

Publication

EP 2026012 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104913 A

Priority

DE 102007037518 A

Abstract (en)

The device has at least one functional element for operating the appliance (1) and a cover (7) for optionally covering at least one functional element. The cover is mounted so that it can move along a surface of the appliance between at least one rest position, in which it at least partially covers the at least one functional element, and an operating position, in which the at least one functional element is at least partially exposed and another part of the appliance is covered.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Haushaltsgerät mit mindestens einem Funktionselement (2, 3) zur Bedienung des Haushaltsgeräts und einer Abdeckung (7, 72) für ein optionales Abdecken mindestens eines der Funktionselemente (2, 3) beschrieben. Das Haushaltsgerät zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass die Abdeckung (7, 72) so gelagert ist, dass diese entlang einer Oberfläche (1) des Haushaltsgeräts zumindest zwischen einer Ruheposition, in der die Abdeckung (7, 72) das mindestens eine Funktionselement (2, 3) zumindest teilweise abdeckt, und einer Betriebsposition, in der das mindestens eine Funktionselement (2, 3) freigelegt ist und ein weiterer Teil der Oberfläche (1) des Haushaltsgeräts durch die Abdeckung (7, 72) abgedeckt ist, versetzbar ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/02 (2006.01); F24C 15/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/082 (2013.01); F24C 15/02 (2013.01); F24C 15/36 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026012 A2 20090218; EP 2026012 A3 20110323; DE 102007037518 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-27 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131011

2011-11-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110923

2011-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-03-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24C 7/08 20060101AFI20081024BHEP

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24C 15/02 20060101ALI20110214BHEP

2011-03-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24C 15/36 20060101ALI20110214BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS