Global Patent Index - EP 2026014 A1

EP 2026014 A1 2009-02-18 - A cooking appliance

Title (en)

A cooking appliance

Title (de)

Kochanwendung

Title (fr)

Appareil de cuisson

Publication

EP 2026014 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08252475 A

Priority

GB 0714365 A

Abstract (en)

A cooking appliance (100) comprises: a housing (101) which houses a main oven cavity, the main oven cavity (104) including at least two heat sources, and a removable partition (120) which can be located within the main oven cavity so that it is divided it into two separate ovens (130,140), one of the heat sources being associated with a first one of the ovens and the other heat source with a second one of the ovens, and which can be removed from the main oven cavity to leave a single, larger oven, and control means for controlling the heat sources such that with the removable partition removed both heat sources are operated simultaneously to heat the single larger oven and with the removable partition (120) in place the control means controls the heats sources such that only one of the two separate ovens is heated. The control means may be responsive to the position of the partition so that only the one heat source is operated if the partition is in position as a divider. The appliance can be used as one large oven, or divided to form one smaller oven with only the smaller oven being heated.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026014 A1 20090218; GB 0714365 D0 20070905

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGA RANGEMASTER LIMITED

2009-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS