Global Patent Index - EP 2026019 A2

EP 2026019 A2 2009-02-18 - Tempering unit on a heat pump basis

Title (en)

Tempering unit on a heat pump basis

Title (de)

Temperiereinrichtung auf Wärmepumpenbasis

Title (fr)

Installation d'équilibrage de la température à base de pompe thermique

Publication

EP 2026019 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07023280 A

Priority

DE 202007011546 U

Abstract (en)

The unit has a cooling medium circuit (K) in which a compressor (1), a plate heat exchanger (2), an expansion valve (5), an evaporator (6) and a condenser in a form of another plate heat exchanger (3) are arranged in series connection. The heat exchanger (2) is provided for heat dissipation in the medium circuit. Connection lines of the medium circuit or a heat transmission medium circuit (W) are guided to the heat exchanger (3) by switching valves (96, 97), which are switchable for reversal of a flow direction of a cooling medium and a heat transmission medium in the heat exchanger (3).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Verbesserung einer Temperiereinrichtung auf Wärmepumpenbasis, mit einem Kältemedium-Kreislauf (K), in dem in Reihenschaltung ein Verdichter (1), ein zur Wärmeabgabe bestimmter Kondensator in Form eines ersten Wärmetauschers (2), ein Expansionsventil (5), ein zur Wärmeaufnahme aus einem Fluidstrom bestimmter Verdampfer (6) und gegebenenfalls ein in die Reihenschaltung einbezogener zweiter Wärmetauscher (3) angeordnet sind, und mit einem Wärmetransportmedium-Kreislauf (W), der im allgemeinen ein Wasserkreislaufsystem ist und in den der oder die Wärmetauscher einbezogen sind und der dort in Wärmetauschbeziehung zum Kältemedium-Kreislauf steht.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 13/00 (2006.01); F25B 29/00 (2006.01); F25B 30/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 29/003 (2013.01); F24D 11/0214 (2013.01); F24D 3/08 (2013.01); Y02B 30/125 (2018.05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007011546 U1 20090102; EP 2026019 A2 20090218; EP 2026019 A3 20100825; WO 2009024282 A2 20090226; WO 2009024282 A3 20090618

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110226

2011-05-04 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-04-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KROLL, MARKUS

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KROLL, MARKUS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS