Global Patent Index - EP 2026024 A1

EP 2026024 A1 2009-02-18 - Process and device for producing argon by cryogenic separation of air

Title (en)

Process and device for producing argon by cryogenic separation of air

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Argon durch Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'argon par séparation cryogénique d'air

Publication

EP 2026024 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08012054 A

Priority

  • DE 102007035619 A
  • EP 07019208 A
  • EP 08012054 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves compressing feed air (1) and passing in a distillation column system for nitrogen-oxygen separation. An argon containing flow (72) removes the distillation column system for nitrogen-oxygen separation. A crude argon column (25) is fed to the argon containing flow. A head condenser (24) is formed as return condenser, and a top gas of the crude argon column is passed in the return passage of the return condenser. An independent claim is included for a device for extracting argon by low-temperature separation of air.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren und die Vorrichtung dienen zur Gewinnung von Argon durch Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft. Einsatzluft (1) wird verdichtet (3) und in ein Destilliersäulen-System zur Stickstoff-Sauerstoff-Trennung (13,14) eingeleitet. Dem Destilliersäulen-System zur Stickstoff-Sauerstoff-Trennung wird ein argonhaltiger Strom (72) entnommen. Der argonhaltige Strom (72) wird einer Rohargonsäule (25) zugeleitet. Die Rohargonsäule (25) weist einen Kopfkondensator (24) auf, in dem ein Kopfgas aus der Rohargonsäule (25) mindestens teilweise kondensiert wird. Mindestens ein Teil des dabei gewonnenen Kondensats wird als Rücklaufflüssigkeit auf die Rohargonsäule (25) aufgegeben. Der Rohargonsäule (25) oder dem Kopfkondensator (24) wird ein Rohargonstrom (76, 176, 276a, 276b) entnommen. Der Rohargonstrom (76, 176, 276a, 276b) wird einer Reinargonsäule (20) zugeleitet. Der Reinargonsäule (20) wird ein Reinargonproduktstrom (81) entnommen. Der Kopfkondensator (24) der Rohargonsäule (25) ist als Rücklaufkondensator ausgebildet und Kopfgas der Rohargonsäule wird in die Rücklaufpassagen des Rücklaufkondensators eingeleitet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01); F25J 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04884 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/042 (2013.01); F25J 3/04224 (2013.01); F25J 3/04357 (2013.01); F25J 3/04375 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04624 (2013.01); F25J 3/04678 (2013.01); F25J 3/04721 (2013.01); F25J 3/04727 (2013.01); F25J 5/007 (2013.01); F25J 2205/02 (2013.01); F25J 2245/58 (2013.01); F25J 2250/02 (2013.01); F25J 2250/04 (2013.01); F25J 2290/62 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026024 A1 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20171114

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090907

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090806

2009-08-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS