Global Patent Index - EP 2026025 A1

EP 2026025 A1 2009-02-18 - Process and device for producing high pressure nitrogen by cryogenic separation of air in a single column

Title (en)

Process and device for producing high pressure nitrogen by cryogenic separation of air in a single column

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Druckstickstoff durch Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft in einer Einzelsäule

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de production d'azote sous haute pression par séparation cryogénique d'air dans une colonne simple

Publication

EP 2026025 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08012055 A

Priority

  • DE 102007035603 A
  • EP 07019209 A
  • EP 08012055 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves condensing main gas in condensation passages of a main condenser (3), and feeding cool fluid to an end of evaporation passages. The fed cool fluid is evaporated, and the evaporated cool fluid and the remaining cool fluid in the end are mixed and removed from another end of the evaporation passages. High pressure nitrogen stream (5) is extracted from a single column (2) or the condenser, where the condenser is formed as a reflux condenser. The main gas column is passed into the condensation passages, which are formed as return passages. An independent claim is also included for a device for producing high pressure nitrogen by cryogenic analysis of air.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren und die Vorrichtung dienen zur Gewinnung von Druckstickstoff durch Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft in einer Einzelsäule. Einsatzluft (1) wird in die Einzelsäule (2) eingeleitet. Die Einzelsäule weist einen Kopfkondensator (3) auf, in dem ein Kopfgas aus der Einzelsäule mindestens teilweise kondensiert wird. Mindestens ein Teil des dabei gewonnenen Kondensats wird als Rücklaufflüssigkeit auf die Einzelsäule aufgegeben. Aus der Einzelsäule oder dem Kopfkondensator wird ein Druckstickstoffstrom (5) abgezogen und als Druckstickstoffprodukt gewonnen. Der Kopfkondensator ist als Rücklaufkondensator ausgebildet. Kopfgas der Einzelsäule wird in die Rücklaufpassagen des Rücklaufkondensators eingeleitet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04284 (2013.01); F25J 3/04624 (2013.01); F25J 2200/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026025 A1 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140201

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090806

2009-08-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS