Global Patent Index - EP 2026028 A2

EP 2026028 A2 2009-02-18 - Heat exchanger, more particularly for automotive vehicle

Title (en)

Heat exchanger, more particularly for automotive vehicle

Title (de)

Wärmeübertrager, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Échangeur de chaleur, en particulier pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 2026028 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08018381 A

Priority

  • DE 10163202 A
  • DE 10234118 A
  • DE 10240556 A
  • EP 02798351 A
  • EP 0214581 W

Abstract (en)

The device has pipes carrying a first medium in heat exchange channels between containers and arranged in a flow of a second medium. An end piece contains a collection box with a housing and at least one collection chamber. The housing and a cover plate for at least one through channel have coaxial openings via which the collection chamber(s) communicates with the through channel(s). An independent claim is also included for the following: a coolant heat exchanger, especially for a motor vehicle air conditioning system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wärmeübertrager (1) mit Rohren (2,3) und zumindest einem Endstück, das einen Rohrboden aufweist, der eine Bodenplatte (8), eine Umlenkplatte (12) und eine Abdeckplatte (16) umfaßt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); B60H 1/32 (2006.01); F25B 1/00 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F28D 1/047 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 21/06 (2006.01); F28F 21/08 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0278 (2013.01); F28D 1/0478 (2013.01); F28D 1/05391 (2013.01); F28F 9/0221 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0073 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0085 (2013.01); F28F 2280/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO

EPO simple patent family

WO 03054467 A1 20030703; AT 412863 T 20081115; AT 458975 T 20100315; AT 461407 T 20100415; AU 2002358769 A1 20030709; AU 2002360056 A1 20030709; AU 2002363887 A1 20030709; BR 0215231 A 20041116; BR 0215235 A 20041116; BR PI0215085 A2 20160628; CA 2471164 A1 20030703; CA 2471164 C 20091006; CN 100342196 C 20071010; CN 100368752 C 20080213; CN 1620589 A 20050525; CN 1620590 A 20050525; DE 10260029 A1 20040205; DE 10260030 A1 20030703; DE 10260107 A1 20031002; DE 50212972 D1 20081211; DE 50214246 D1 20100408; DE 50214296 D1 20100429; EP 1459025 A1 20040922; EP 1459025 B1 20100317; EP 1459026 A1 20040922; EP 1459026 B1 20100224; EP 1459027 A1 20040922; EP 1459027 B1 20081029; EP 2026028 A2 20090218; EP 2026028 A3 20120620; ES 2316640 T3 20090416; JP 2005513401 A 20050512; JP 2005513402 A 20050512; JP 2005513403 A 20050512; JP 2008180503 A 20080807; JP 4121085 B2 20080716; JP 4331611 B2 20090916; JP 4473321 B2 20100602; KR 100925910 B1 20091109; KR 20040063952 A 20040714; MX PA04006151 A 20041101; US 2005006073 A1 20050113; US 2005039901 A1 20050224; US 2005103486 A1 20050519; US 2009126920 A1 20090521; US 7318470 B2 20080115; US 7481266 B2 20090127; US 7650935 B2 20100126; US 8590607 B2 20131126; WO 03054465 A1 20030703; WO 03054466 A1 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-27 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2018-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOTSCH, MARTIN, DIPL.-ING.

2018-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STAFFA, KARL-HEINZ, DIPL.-ING.

2018-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WALTER, CHRISTOPH, DIPL.-ING.

2018-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEMUTH, WALTER, DIPL.-ING.

2018-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRAUSS, HANS-JOACHIM, DIPL.-ING.

2018-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MITTELSTRASS, HAGEN, DIPL.-ING.

2018-03-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180208

2016-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160229

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAHLE BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

2013-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2013-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121220

2012-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2012-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2012-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28F 9/02 20060101ALI20120515BHEP

2012-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28D 1/047 20060101ALI20120515BHEP

2012-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28D 1/053 20060101AFI20120515BHEP

2012-06-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F28F 1/02 20060101ALI20120515BHEP

2009-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1459027 P

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO