Global Patent Index - EP 2026146 A2

EP 2026146 A2 2009-02-18 - Switch panel for a timeswitch

Title (en)

Switch panel for a timeswitch

Title (de)

Schaltscheibe für eine Schaltuhr

Title (fr)

Disque de commutation pour un interrupteur horaire

Publication

EP 2026146 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08012441 A

Priority

DE 102007038569 A

Abstract (en)

The panel (1) has programming units (4) and a single or multi-part programming unit carrier (2, 3), which is arranged to swivellably store the programming units between two end positions, where the end positions correspond to two possible programming, respectively. The programming unit comprises two display and operation sections (41, 42) for indicating the position of programming units, where one of the sections makes possible rotation of programming units in one of the end positions and other makes possible rotation of programming units in other end position by a user.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Schaltscheibe (1) für eine Schaltuhr mit Programmierelementen (4) und mit einem ein oder mehrteiligen Programmierelementeträger (2, 3), der geeignet und eingerichtet ist die Programmierelemente (4) zwischen einer ersten und einer zweiten Endstellung schwenkbar zu lagern, wobei die erste Endstellung einer möglichen ersten Programmierung und die zweite Endstellung einer möglichen zweiten Programmierung entspricht und wobei die Programmierelemente (4) je einen ersten Anzeige- und Betätigungsabschnitt (41) umfassen, der die Stellung des Programmierelements (4) anzeigt und ein Schwenken des Programmierelements (4) in die erste oder zweite Endstellung durch einen Benutzer ermöglicht, wobei die Programmierelemente (4) je einen zweiten Anzeige- und Betätigungsabschnitt (42) umfassen, der die Stellung des Programmierelements (4) anzeigt und ein Schwenken des Programmierelements (4) in die erste oder zweite Endstellung durch einen Benutzer ermöglicht.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 15/00 (2006.01); G04C 23/10 (2006.01); H01H 43/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 15/006 (2013.01); G04C 23/10 (2013.01); H01H 43/065 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026146 A2 20090218; EP 2026146 A3 20100602; EP 2026146 B1 20130501; CN 101369500 A 20090218; CN 101369500 B 20130529; DE 102007038569 A1 20090226; ES 2422599 T3 20130912

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-05-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008009820

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140204

2013-09-12 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2422599 T3

- Effective date: 20130912

2013-06-27 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008009820

- Effective date: 20130627

2013-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2012-02-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120112

2011-10-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEGRAND GMBH

2011-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2010-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100907

2010-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G04G 15/00 20060101AFI20081217BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G04C 23/10 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2010-06-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 43/06 20060101ALI20100429BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS