Global Patent Index - EP 2026204 A1

EP 2026204 A1 2009-02-18 - Method and apparatus for updating the state of a computing device

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for updating the state of a computing device

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Aktualisierung des Status eines Datenverarbeitungsgeräts

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de détermination de la mise à jour d'un dispositif informatique

Publication

EP 2026204 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07114070 A

Priority

EP 07114070 A

Abstract (en)

According to embodiments described in the specification, a method, and apparatus for updating the state of a computing device by first receiving a message processable by the computing device, the message comprising data for instructing the computing device to request at least one update file from at least one remote computing entity, the at least one update file for updating a file resident on the computing device; and processing the message to effect updating of the computing device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/445 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 8/60 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 1519268 A2 20050330 - CURITEL COMM INC [KR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026204 A1 20090218; CA 2638078 A1 20090209; CN 101364994 A 20090211; CN 101364994 B 20130605; KR 20090015830 A 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-25 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161214

2013-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BLACKBERRY LIMITED

2013-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BLACKBERRY LIMITED

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070809

- Countries: AL

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070809

- Countries: BA

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070809

- Countries: HR

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070809

- Countries: MK

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070809

- Countries: RS

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070809

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS