Global Patent Index - EP 2026289 A1

EP 2026289 A1 2009-02-18 - Compartment facility; method for identifying a person and selection of functions of the compartment facility

Title (en)

Compartment facility; method for identifying a person and selection of functions of the compartment facility

Title (de)

Fachanlage; Verfahren zur Identifikation einer Person und Auswahl von Funktionen der Fachanlage

Title (fr)

Instalation à compartiments spécialisée; procédé pour un transfert de données sur des instalations à compartiments

Publication

EP 2026289 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07015592 A

Priority

EP 07015592 A

Abstract (en)

The box system has multiple boxes for the placement and collection of objects. An operating unit (20) has a key receptacle (30). The key receptacle has a reading unit (31) for reading a distinct key identification from a key (40). The operating unit has an input unit (32) for entering a distinct user identification and a computing unit (33) for comparing the key identification detected by the reading unit to the user identification entered into the input unit. The input unit has a Radio-frequency identificationreader. An independent claim is included for a method for identifying a person at an electronic box system and for determining the functions of the box system available to the person by an operating unit of the box system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fachanlage (10), umfassend mehrere Fächer (11) zur Einstellung und Abholung von Gegenständen, wobei die Fachanlage eine Bedieneinheit (20) aufweist, über welche eine Person identifizierbar und verschiedene Funktionen der Fachanlage (10) aktivierbar sind. Die Bedieneinheit (20) weist eine Schlüsselaufnahme (30;30') auf, die mit verschiedenen Arten von Schlüsseln in unterschiedliche Schlüsselpositionen (50a;50b;50c) bewegbar ist, wobei jeder Schlüsselposition (50;50a;50b;50c;50d) eine Funktion der Fachanlage (10) zugeordnet ist, welche bei Stellung eines Schlüssels (40;40') in der jeweiligen Position aktivierbar ist. Die Schlüsselaufnahme (30;30') weist ferner Auslesemittel (31) zum Auslesen einer eindeutigen Schlüsselidentifikation aus dem Schlüssel (40;40') auf, und die Bedieneinheit (20) umfasst Eingabemittel (32) zur Eingabe einer eindeutigen Nutzeridentifikation und Rechenmittel (33) zum Vergleich der im Auslesemittel (31) erfassten Schlüsselidentifikation und der im Eingabemittel (32) eingegebenen Nutzeridentifikation. Das Rechenmittel (33) ist dabei so ausgebildet, dass es eine Bewegung der Schlüsselaufnahme (30;30') in eine erste Schlüsselposition (50a) freigibt, wenn die beiden verglichenen Identifikationen übereinstimmen oder eine Zuordnung zwischen ihnen besteht. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zur Identifikation einer Person an einer elektronischen Fachanlage (10) und zur Festlegung der für eine Person verfügbaren Funktionen der Fachanlage (10) über eine Bedieneinheit (20) der Fachanlage (10).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01); A47G 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026289 A1 20090218; WO 2009018921 A1 20090212; WO 2009018921 A9 20100304

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120229

2011-10-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPARTMENT FACILITY; METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A PERSON AND SELECTION OF FUNCTIONS OF THE COMPARTMENT FACILITY

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090923

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BENZ, RAMIN

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRANKENBERG, STEFFEN

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUNZ, JOACHIM

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEY, THORSTEN

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS