Global Patent Index - EP 2026300 A1

EP 2026300 A1 2009-02-18 - Gaming system and a method of gaming

Title (en)

Gaming system and a method of gaming

Title (de)

Spielsystem und Spielverfahren

Title (fr)

Système de jeu et procédé de jeu

Publication

EP 2026300 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08161710 A

Priority

AU 2007904140 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a gaming system and method for playing a game which is able to achieve a jackpot outcome when a jackpot trigger condition is satisfied. The jackpot trigger condition may be changed on instructions from a jackpot controller. In one embodiment, the jackpot trigger condition of an electronic gaming machine is re-set from time to time by a jackpot controller. The system may be used to play games like Keno or Bingo on EGMs, the jackpot controller downloading jackpot trigger conditions for the Keno or Bingo game (e.g. Keno or Bingo numbers).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026300 A1 20090218; AU 2008203460 A1 20090219; AU 2008203460 B2 20110825; US 2009191956 A1 20090730

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100413

2009-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS