Global Patent Index - EP 2026302 A1

EP 2026302 A1 2009-02-18 - A gaming system and a method of gaming

Title (en)

A gaming system and a method of gaming

Title (de)

Spielsystem und Spielverfahren

Title (fr)

Système de jeu et procédé de jeu

Publication

EP 2026302 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08162456 A

Priority

  • AU 2007904386 A
  • AU 2007905676 A

Abstract (en)

A gaming machine comprising, a standalone module arranged to implement a standalone game; and a server module arranged to generate server game data to be employed by at least one other gaming machine to implement a server game.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3267 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026302 A1 20090218; AU 2008205413 A1 20090305; AU 2011250701 A1 20111201; AU 2011250701 B2 20120712; US 2009181773 A1 20090716

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100416

2009-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091005

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090817

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS