Global Patent Index - EP 2026304 A2

EP 2026304 A2 2009-02-18 - Method of gaming, game controller, and a gaming system

Title (en)

Method of gaming, game controller, and a gaming system

Title (de)

Spielverfahren, Spielsteuerung und Spielsystem

Title (fr)

Procédé de jeu, contrôleur de jeu, et système de jeu

Publication

EP 2026304 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08162502 A

Priority

  • AU 2007904445 A
  • AU 2008900351 A

Abstract (en)

A method of gaming comprising conducting at least one dual game round, each dual game round being conducted by: generating a game outcome; determining whether to make an award in respect of the game outcome; and randomly determining whether to make a special award independently of the game outcome.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3258 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026304 A2 20090218; EP 2026304 A3 20090805; AU 2008203530 A1 20090305; US 2009176563 A1 20090709

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100914

2010-04-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100205

2009-08-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-08-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS