Global Patent Index - EP 2026418 A2

EP 2026418 A2 2009-02-18 - Housing muffler with embedded component with at least one electromechanical component

Title (en)

Housing muffler with embedded component with at least one electromechanical component

Title (de)

Gehäuseschale mit eingeschlossener, mindestens ein elektromechanisches Bauelement aufweisenden Baueinheit

Title (fr)

Coque de boîtier comprenant une unité de construction intégrée dotée d'au moins un composant électromécanique

Publication

EP 2026418 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08405167 A

Priority

CH 11112007 A

Abstract (en)

The muffler has an embedded component (2) with an electromechanical or electronic component, and a connecting plug fixed with an external connection, and enclosing a free contact end (14) of an electrical conductor (16). The conductor is aligned outwards from the component (2) to the connecting plug by a side wall. The conductor is surrounded by a plastic material of a fixing body (19) in an area that runs from the electronic component up to the contact end, where the fixing body is fixedly embedded by the muffler in a form-fit manner.

Abstract (de)

Die Gehäuseschale (1) umschliesst mindestens eine elektronische oder elektromechanische Baueinheit (2) und hat mehrerer elektrischer Leiter (16), die für einen seitlichen Aussenanschluss querversetzt zu einer Leiterplatte (3) mit einem freien Kontaktende (14) in einem Anschlussstecker (11,18) enden,. Dabei sind sie von der elektronischen Baueinheit (2) bis zu den Kontaktenden (14) einschliesslich ihrer die Querversetzung ermöglichenden Krümmungen vom Kunststoffmaterial eines von der Gehäuseschale (1) formschlüssig eingeschlossenen Fixierkörpers (19,20) dicht umschlossen. Auf diese Weise ergibt sich eine einfachere Herstellung mit weniger Herstellungs- und Montageschritten bei Verwendung von weniger Einzelteilen. Ausserdem kann die Gehäuseschale (1) auf einfache Weise modulartig mit verschiedenartig ausgeführten Anschlussteckern (18) kombiniert sein.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/405 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5202 (2013.01); H01R 13/405 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026418 A2 20090218; EP 2026418 A3 20120104; EP 2026418 B1 20180912

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 1041687 T

- Effective date: 20181015

2018-10-11 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008016334

2018-10-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT, CH

2018-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2018-09-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2018-07-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180627

2016-12-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161124

2012-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-08-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120704

2012-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-01-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 13/405 20060101AFI20111129BHEP

2012-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 13/52 20060101ALI20111129BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS