Global Patent Index - EP 2026431 A2

EP 2026431 A2 2009-02-18 - Switch module for an electrical switch device

Title (en)

Switch module for an electrical switch device

Title (de)

Schaltermodul für eine elektrische Schaltanlage

Title (fr)

Module de commutateur pour un dispositif de commutation électrique

Publication

EP 2026431 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07024707 A

Priority

DE 102006056656 A

Abstract (en)

The switch module (10), has a metallic housing (11), which has a cylindrical base body (12) with a longitudinal axis and a right angled outlet (13) that sticks out from the base body. The housing has another outlet (14) and each of the two outlets are fluid-tight connected with insulated bushings (18,19). A metallic contact piece (20,21) is accommodated in each of the two bushings in a fluid-tight manner. The contact pieces are connected by a position switch and the circuit breaker accessible from outside, which are provided with a bar (25) for actuation.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Schaltermodul (10) für eine elektrische Schaltanlage, insbesondere für eine Mittelspannungsschaltanlage beschrieben. Das Schaltermodul ist mit einem metallischen Gehäuse (11) versehen, in dem ein Dreistellungsschalter und/oder ein Leistungsschalter untergebracht sind/ist, und das mit einer Isolierflüssigkeit (27) gefüllt ist. Das Gehäuse weist einen im wesentlichen zylindrischen Grundkörper (12) mit einer Längsachse auf. Das Gehäuse weist einen etwa rechtwinklig vom Grundkörper abstehenden Abgang (13) sowie einen weiteren Abgang (14) auf. Jeder der beiden Abgänge ist mit einer isolierenden Durchführung (18, 19) flüssigkeitsdicht verbunden. In jeder der beiden Durchführungen ist ein metallisches Kontaktstück (20, 21) flüssigkeitsdicht aufgenommen. Die Kontaktstücke sind von außen zugänglich. Weiterhin sind die Kontaktstücke mit dem Dreistellungsschalter und/oder dem Leistungsschalter verbunden. Der Dreistellungsschalter und/oder der Leistungsschalter sind/ist zur Betätigung mit einer Stange (25) versehen, die an einem Ende des Grundkörpers aus dem Gehäuse flüssigkeitsdicht herausgeführt ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02B 13/035 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01); H01H 31/32 (2006.01); H01H 33/00 (2006.01); H01H 33/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 31/003 (2013.01); H01H 31/32 (2013.01); H01H 33/6606 (2013.01); H01H 33/666 (2013.01); H01H 33/6661 (2013.01); H01H 33/55 (2013.01); H01H 2033/566 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006056656 A1 20080612; EP 2026431 A2 20090218; EP 2026431 A3 20090624

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130511

2010-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091223

2009-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091113

2009-06-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-06-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS