Global Patent Index - EP 2026447 A1

EP 2026447 A1 2009-02-18 - STATOR FOR ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE

Title (en)

STATOR FOR ROTATING ELECTRIC MACHINE

Title (de)

STATOR FÜR EINE ROTIERENDE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE

Title (fr)

STATOR POUR MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE TOURNANTE

Publication

EP 2026447 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06756912 A

Priority

JP 2006311077 W

Abstract (en)

In a dynamoelectric stator, a coil group is divided into a plurality of coil segments that are adjacent to each other in a circumferential direction of a core. Each of the coil segments includes a plurality of stepped coils that are adjacent to each other in a circumferential direction of the core. Each of the stepped coils has: a large diameter portion that is adjacent to the core back portion; and a small diameter portion that is adjacent to the large diameter portion on a radially inner side of the core and that has a smaller diameter than that of the large diameter portion. A step portion that results from the difference in diameter is formed between each of the large diameter portions and each of the small diameter portions. Positions of the step portions in each of the coil segments are offset toward the radially inner side of the core sequentially from a stepped coil that is positioned at a first circumferential end portion of the core.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 1/18 (2006.01); H02K 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 3/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026447 A1 20090218; EP 2026447 A4 20120523; CN 101218731 A 20080709; JP 4782011 B2 20110928; JP WO2007141830 A1 20091015; WO 2007141830 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121122

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2012-05-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120423

2012-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02K 1/18 20060101AFI20120417BHEP

2012-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02K 3/18 20060101ALI20120417BHEP

2010-08-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070904

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU