Global Patent Index - EP 2026472 A1

EP 2026472 A1 2009-02-18 - Method and apparatus for adaptive carrier allocation and power control in multi-carrier communication systems

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for adaptive carrier allocation and power control in multi-carrier communication systems

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur adaptiven Trägerzuweisung und Leistungssteuerung in Mehrträgerkommunikationssystemen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour l'attribution de support adaptatif et contrôle de puissance dans des systèmes de communication multi-porteur

Publication

EP 2026472 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08105483 A

Priority

  • EP 02808132 A
  • US 0236030 W

Abstract (en)

An apparatus and process for allocating carriers in a multicarrier system is described. In on embodiment, the process comprises determining a location (E, D, C, B, A; fig. 6 ) of a subscriber (520) with respect to a base station (510), selecting carriers from a band of carriers to allocate to the subscriber (520) according to the location of the subscriber with respect to the base station (510), and allocating selected carriers to the subscriber (520).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 5/00 (2006.01); H04B 7/005 (2006.01); H04L 5/02 (2006.01); H04L 27/26 (2006.01); H04W 36/16 (2009.01); H04W 52/14 (2009.01); H04W 52/28 (2009.01); H04W 52/36 (2009.01); H04W 52/42 (2009.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/16 (2006.01); H04W 52/16 (2009.01); H04W 52/24 (2009.01); H04W 52/52 (2009.01); H04W 72/06 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/42 (2013.01); H04L 5/0037 (2013.01); H04L 5/0044 (2013.01); H04L 5/006 (2013.01); H04W 36/16 (2013.01); H04W 52/146 (2013.01); H04W 52/283 (2013.01); H04W 52/367 (2013.01); H04L 5/0007 (2013.01); H04L 27/2608 (2013.01); H04W 52/16 (2013.01); H04W 52/24 (2013.01); H04W 52/248 (2013.01); H04W 52/52 (2013.01); H04W 72/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9815153 A1 19980409 - ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]
  • [A] EP 0946070 A2 19990929 - NEC CORP [JP]
  • [A] EP 1094644 A2 20010425 - QUALCOMM INC [US]
  • [A] EP 1185019 A2 20020306 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
  • [XA] KERPEZ K J: "The channel capacity of hybrid fiber/coax (HFC) networks", INFORMATION THEORY, 1995. PROCEEDINGS., 1995 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON WHISTLER, BC, CANADA 17-22 SEPT. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, 17 September 1995 (1995-09-17), pages 481, XP010192368, ISBN: 0-7803-2453-6
  • [XA] WALDECK T ET AL: "Telecommunication applications over the low voltage power distribution grid", SPREAD SPECTRUM TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS., 1998 IEEE 5TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUN CITY, SOUTH AFRICA 2-4 SEPT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, vol. 1, 2 September 1998 (1998-09-02), pages 73 - 77, XP010307710, ISBN: 0-7803-4281-X
  • [A] GOURGUE F ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS: "AIR INTERFACE OF THE FUTURE EUROPEAN FULLY DIGITAL TRUNK RADIO SYSTEM", PERSONAL COMMUNICATION - FREEDOM THROUGH WIRELESS TECHNOLOGY. SECAUCUS, NJ., MAY 18 - 20, 1993; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, vol. CONF. 43, 18 May 1993 (1993-05-18), pages 714 - 717, XP000393282, ISBN: 978-0-7803-1267-8

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2004045228 A1 20040527; AT 554558 T 20120515; AU 2002364698 A1 20040603; CA 2506205 A1 20040527; CA 2506205 C 20130312; CN 101951675 A 20110119; CN 101951675 B 20120606; CN 1732698 A 20060208; CN 1732698 B 20121031; EP 1559281 A1 20050803; EP 1559281 A4 20070530; EP 1559281 B1 20120418; EP 2026472 A1 20090218; JP 2006506014 A 20060216; KR 101062630 B1 20110907; KR 20060055433 A 20060523; US 2006154684 A1 20060713; US 2011312367 A1 20111222; US 8005479 B2 20110823

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-05 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127178

2015-06-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141204

2014-08-20 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140724

2013-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADAPTIX, INC.

2013-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 5/00 20060101AFI20130411BHEP

2013-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 27/26 20060101ALI20130411BHEP

2011-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADAPTIX, INC.

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2009-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-18 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127178

2009-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090721

2009-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1559281 P

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR