Global Patent Index - EP 2026601 A1

EP 2026601 A1 2009-02-18 - Frequency transposition applications for improving spatial hearing abilities of subjects with high-frequency hearing losses

Title (en)

Frequency transposition applications for improving spatial hearing abilities of subjects with high-frequency hearing losses

Title (de)

Frequenztranspositionsanwendungen zur Verbesserung des räumlichen Hörvermögens von Personen mit hochfrequentem Hörverlust

Title (fr)

Application de transposition de fréquence pour améliorer les capacités d'écoute spatiale de sujets souffrant de pertes auditives dans les hautes fréquences

Publication

EP 2026601 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07114028 A

Priority

EP 07114028 A

Abstract (en)

A method of configuring a frequency transposition scheme for transposing a set of received frequencies of an audio signal received by a hearing aid worn by a subject to a transposed set of frequencies, wherein the method comprises determining at least one subject-dependent parameter indicative of the subject's ability to detect audio frequencies, and at least one subject-dependent parameter indicative of the location in frequency of one or more spectral cues, configuring a subject-dependent frequency transposition scheme based on the determined subject-dependent parameters, the subject-dependent frequency transposition scheme being configured so as to improve the subject's spatial hearing capabilities, and adapting the hearing aid to perform the configured subject-dependent frequency transposition scheme.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/353 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 2005015952 A1 20050217 - VAST AUDIO PTY LTD [AU], et al
  • [A] EP 1414268 A2 20040428 - SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]
  • [A] WO 0154453 A1 20010726 - UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al
  • [Y] IIDA ET AL: "Median plane localization using a parametric model of the head-related transfer function based on spectral cues", APPLIED ACOUSTICS, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, GB, vol. 68, no. 8, 5 May 2007 (2007-05-05), pages 835 - 850, XP022061128, ISSN: 0003-682X
  • [A] ZOTKIN D N ET AL: "HRTF personalization using anthropometric measurements", 19 October 2003, APPLICATIONS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING TO AUDIO AND ACOUSTICS, 2003 IEEE WORKSHOP ON. NEW PALTZ, NY, USA OCT,. 19-22, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PAGE(S) 157-160, ISBN: 0-7803-7850-4, XP010697926
  • [A] NISHINO ET AL: "Estimation of HRTFs on the horizontal plane using physical features", 5 May 2007, APPLIED ACOUSTICS, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, GB, PAGE(S) 897-908, ISSN: 0003-682X, XP022061132
  • [A] BEST VIRGINIA ET AL: "The role of high frequencies in speech localization", 6 July 2005, JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AIP / ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, MELVILLE, NY, US, PAGE(S) 353-363, ISSN: 0001-4966, XP012073181
  • [A] CRAIG JIN ET AL: "Perceptual spatial audio-coding", 6 July 2003, PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUDITORY DISPLAY, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 255-258, XP002433741

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026601 A1 20090218; CN 101370325 A 20090218; CN 101370325 B 20140108

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100402

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090911

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS