Global Patent Index - EP 2026605 A1

EP 2026605 A1 2009-02-18 - Hearing aid with elastically supported earpiece

Title (en)

Hearing aid with elastically supported earpiece

Title (de)

Hörereinrichtung mit elastisch gelagertem Hörer

Title (fr)

Appareil auditif doté d'un écouteur installé de manière élastique

Publication

EP 2026605 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08104702 A

Priority

  • DE 102007037024 A
  • US 96361407 P

Abstract (en)

The device has a hollow-cylindrical connector (11) i.e. tubular connector, frictionally locked and force-fitted into a borehole. The borehole is arranged in an earmold (10), and a receiver i.e. longish receiver, is longitudinally frictionally locked and force-fitted with the connector. The connector is made from a rubber or a rubbery-elastic plastic. A cerumen protection element (13) is force-fitted with the connector at sound exit side. Multiple ridges extend along peripheral direction on an outer shell of the connector.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer im Gehörgang zu fixierenden Hörereinrichtung insbesondere für Hörgeräte mit externem Hörer soll der Hörer in dem Ohrpassstück akustisch vorteilhaft und vor Verschmutzungen geschützt sowie leicht austauschbar gelagert sein. Daher ist eine Hörereinrichtung mit einem länglichen Hörer (14) und einem Ohrpassstück (10) vorgesehen, das eine Bohrung (20) aufweist, in die der Hörer (14) gesteckt ist. Ein rohrförmiges Zwischenstück, das elastischer als der Hörer und das Ohrpassstück ist, dient zur reibschlüssigen Aufnahme des Hörers (14) im größten Teil seiner Längserstreckung. Das Zwischenstück (11) ist seinerseits reibschlüssig in einer Bohrung (20) des Ohrpassstücks (10) eingepresst. Damit ist der Hörer (14) elastisch gelagert und er kann mit Hilfe eines stiftförmigen Werkzeugs leicht zusammen mit dem Zwischenstück (11) aus dem Ohrpassstück (10) zum Austausch herausgedrückt werden.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/65 (2013.01); H04R 25/604 (2013.01); H04R 25/656 (2013.01); H04R 1/1016 (2013.01); H04R 25/654 (2013.01); H04R 2225/021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026605 A1 20090218; CN 101389157 A 20090318; DE 102007037024 A1 20090226; US 2009041261 A1 20090212; US 8218803 B2 20120710

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130305

2010-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101021

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090223

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS