Global Patent Index - EP 2026608 A2

EP 2026608 A2 2009-02-18 - Hearing aid with customised components

Title (en)

Hearing aid with customised components

Title (de)

Hörvorrichtung mit angepassten Komponenten

Title (fr)

Dispositif auditif doté de composants adaptés

Publication

EP 2026608 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104803 A

Priority

DE 102007037660 A

Abstract (en)

The hearing apparatus has a housing (1) of predetermined form accommodating the active, electronic components such as a receiver (4) or microphone. The component housing of trapezoidal, triangular of oval cross sectional shape is modified corresponding to the form of the housing shape and the form of other components of hearing apparatus.

Abstract (de)

Um ein nicht nutzbares freies Volumen in einem Gehäuse (1; 11) einer Hörvorrichtung zu minimieren, wird eine Hörvorrichtung vorgeschlagen, die ein Gehäuse (1; 11) umfasst, welches eine vorbestimmte Form aufweist, und mindestens eine aktive, elektronische Komponente, die in dem Gehäuse (1; 11) angeordnet ist, wobei die Komponente eine Form aufweist, die an die Form des Gehäuses (1; 11) und/oder an die Form einer anderen Komponente der Hörvorrichtung angepasst ist. Dadurch kann das nicht nutzbare Restvolumen in der Hörvorrichtung minimiert und somit generell eine kleinere Form des Gehäuses erzielt werden.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/604 (2013.01); H04R 25/65 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026608 A2 20090218; EP 2026608 A3 20120118; DE 102007037660 A1 20090226; US 2009041278 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121128

2012-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120305

2012-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-01-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-01-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 25/00 20060101AFI20111212BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS