Global Patent Index - EP 2026631 A1

EP 2026631 A1 2009-02-18 - Cooking appliance, especially domestic cooking appliance

Title (en)

Cooking appliance, especially domestic cooking appliance

Title (de)

Gargerät, insbesondere Haushaltsgargerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de cuisson, en particulier appareil de cuisson domestique

Publication

EP 2026631 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07016159 A

Priority

EP 07016159 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a cooking appliance (1), especially to a domestic cooking appliance, having at least one induction heating element (2, 3, 4, 5) and a control unit (6), wherein the control unit (6) has at least one adjustment knob (7) by which a shaft (8) can be rotated which is connected to an adjustment device (9) for a cooking parameter, which is part of the control unit (6). To allow an easy use and a good mechanical feedback in adjusting cooking parameters, the invention is characterized in that the adjustment device (9) comprises a resistance element which is connected to a analogue/digital converter (10), wherein the digital signal of the analogue/digital converter (10) is communicating with a control element (11) by means of a bus system (12).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026631 A1 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090406

2009-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090226

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS