Global Patent Index - EP 2026633 A2

EP 2026633 A2 2009-02-18 - Heating cooker

Title (en)

Heating cooker

Title (de)

Gargerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de cuisson chauffant

Publication

EP 2026633 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08150457 A

Priority

KR 20070082732 A

Abstract (en)

A heating cooker capable of minimizing deformation of an upper plate and expanding the volume of a cooking chamber is disclosed. The heating cooker includes a main body which includes an upper plate and a rear plate to define a cooking chamber, and a protruding portion which is formed by protruding a portion of the upper plate upward, wherein the protruding portion is extended to a rear end portion of the upper plate such that a rear end thereof is coupled to the rear plate.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6426 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

KR 20070082732 A 20070822 - HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2026633 A2 20090218; EP 2026633 A3 20130731; KR 20090018341 A 20090220

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160429

2014-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2014-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140130

2014-03-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05B 6/80 20060101AFI20130625BHEP

2013-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H05B 6/80 20060101AFI20130221BHEP

2012-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS