Global Patent Index - EP 2026654 A2

EP 2026654 A2 2009-02-25 - MACROPHAGE MIGRATION INHIBITORY FACTOR ANTAGONISTS AND METHODS OF USING SAME

Title (en)

MACROPHAGE MIGRATION INHIBITORY FACTOR ANTAGONISTS AND METHODS OF USING SAME

Title (de)

MAKROPHAGEN-MIGRATIONS-HEMMFAKTOR-ANTAGONISTEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU FACTEUR D'INHIBITION DE LA MIGRATION DES MACROPHAGES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 2026654 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07811937 A

Priority

  • US 2007069672 W
  • US 80867906 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140263A2] Methods of inhibiting one or more biological activities of Macrophage migration inhibitory factor (MIF) polypeptides are provided using an MIF inhibitory compound. The methods include therapeutic methods for treating cancers and inflammatory diseases.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/54 (2006.01); A61K 31/513 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/513 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007140263 A2 20071206; WO 2007140263 A3 20081120; WO 2007140263 A9 20080403; AU 2007267593 A1 20071206; AU 2007267593 B2 20130404; CA 2653733 A1 20071206; CN 101528039 A 20090909; EP 2026654 A2 20090225; EP 2026654 A4 20130717; JP 2009541214 A 20091126; US 2011009412 A1 20110113; US 8999984 B2 20150407

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151201

2014-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140318

2013-07-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130617

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/513 20060101ALI20130611BHEP

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01N 43/54 20060101AFI20130611BHEP

2013-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 35/00 20060101ALN20130611BHEP

2009-10-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081223

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS