Global Patent Index - EP 2026657 A1

EP 2026657 A1 2009-02-25 - ANTI-CANCER COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME

Title (en)

ANTI-CANCER COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME

Title (de)

MITTEL GEGEN KREBS UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ANTICANCÉREUSE ET SA MÉTHODE D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 2026657 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07784125 A

Priority

  • US 2007069695 W
  • US 80808106 P
  • US 80998406 P
  • US 87985707 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140280A1] This invention encompasses an expeditious method and compositions that have been found to show selective cytotoxicity against several different cancer cell lines. for treating a wide variety cancer neoplasms that have tumor microenvironments by administering a stand-alone anti-tumor chemotherapeutic composition or administered as an adjunct with chemotherapy and/or radiotherapy with enhanced tumor site affinity that preferentially elevates the pH at the tumor site to suppress and eliminates the acidic tumor microenvironment, administered as chemosensitizing and/or radiosensitizers enhancing the tumor, suppression, remission and inhibit tumor metastisis. The invention encompasses controlling mechanisms of intracellular and extracellular ionic physiology through the administration of alkali salts for pH modulating and for restoring and enhancing ionic physiology. The compositions are useful in effective treatment of cancers, particularly malignant melanomas and squamous cell carcinomas (SCCs), thereby inhibiting angiogenesis, reducing metastatic proliferation, supressing tumor generated induced acidotic pain.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 33/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0014 (2013.01); A61K 33/00 (2013.01); A61K 33/24 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 33/00 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 33/24 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007140280 A1 20071206; EP 2026657 A1 20090225; EP 2026657 A4 20091209

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120811

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100212

2009-12-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 33/00 20060101AFI20091103BHEP

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 45/06 20060101ALI20091103BHEP

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 17/00 20060101ALI20091103BHEP

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 17/02 20060101ALI20091103BHEP

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 29/00 20060101ALI20091103BHEP

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 31/00 20060101ALI20091103BHEP

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20091103BHEP

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081223

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS