Global Patent Index - EP 2026661 A1

EP 2026661 A1 2009-02-25 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A FEED COMPOSITION FOR CATTLE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A FEED COMPOSITION FOR CATTLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FUTTERZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR RINDER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION FOURRAGERE POUR BOVINS

Publication

EP 2026661 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06790921 A

Priority

  • CH 2006000530 W
  • DE 102006026511 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140628A1] The invention relates to a process for producing a feed composition for cattle or the like, in particular a fattening feed, wherein conventional feed is intended to be replaced. In this case, first a premix (1) of cereal components, fat, molasses, vitamins, minerals and/or other ingredients is mixed and conditioned with addition of steam (7) and water (6) and subsequently fed to a mechanical and/or thermal treatment where the mixture is heated, processed and shaped to form porous lumps.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23K 1/00 (2006.01); A23K 1/18 (2006.01); A23L 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23K 50/10 (2016.05); A23K 20/20 (2016.05); A23K 40/20 (2016.05); A23K 40/25 (2016.05); A23P 30/20 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140628A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006026511 A1 20071213; BR PI0621721 A2 20111220; CN 101594786 A 20091202; EP 2026661 A1 20090225; US 2010233321 A1 20100916; WO 2007140628 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-06-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100618

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DROUILLARD, JAMES, S

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WUEEST, URS

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEPENBUSCH, BRANDON

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STRABLER, ROLAND

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081106

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS