Global Patent Index - EP 2026662 A2

EP 2026662 A2 2009-02-25 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF A L-LYSINE CONTAINING FEED ADDITIVE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF A L-LYSINE CONTAINING FEED ADDITIVE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES L-LYSIN ENTHALTENDE FUTTERMITTELADDITIVES

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ADDITIF ALIMENTAIRE POUR ANIMAUX CONTENANT DE LA L-LYSINE

Publication

EP 2026662 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07729018 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054566 W
  • DE 102006026328 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141111A2] The invention relates to a process for producing animal feed additives based on fermentation broth having a high content of L-lysine and to lower-loss processes for producing broths obtained by fermentation using coryneforme bacteria which contains selected mutations, and to these feed additives themselves.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23K 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 13/08 (2013.01); A23K 10/12 (2016.05); A23K 20/142 (2016.05); A23K 40/10 (2016.05); C12N 9/1217 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141111A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007141111 A2 20071213; WO 2007141111 A3 20080306; DE 102006026328 A1 20080103; EP 2026662 A2 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151014

2015-10-14 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090909

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS