Global Patent Index - EP 2026684 A2

EP 2026684 A2 2009-02-25 - VERSATILE TELESCOPIC DOOR HINGE HANGER

Title (en)

VERSATILE TELESCOPIC DOOR HINGE HANGER

Title (de)

VIELSEITIGE TELESKOP-TÜRANGELAUFHÄNGVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

BRIDE POLYVALENTE DE CHARNIÈRE DE PORTE TÉLÉSCOPIQUE

Publication

EP 2026684 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07794980 A

Priority

  • US 2007011821 W
  • US 43973006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007272637A1] A hanger includes a brace member, a main support member and at least one secondary support member. The support members are telescopically connected to one another. The brace member includes a vertical shaft having orifice for attachment to a door hinge and hinge pin. The main support member is connected to the brace member and extends outwardly therefrom at approximately a right angle to the vertical shaft.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 29/087 (2006.01); A47F 5/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/0685 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007139717A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2007272637 A1 20071129; CA 2651638 A1 20071206; CN 201337292 Y 20091104; EP 2026684 A2 20090225; WO 2007139717 A2 20071206; WO 2007139717 A3 20081030; WO 2007139717 B1 20081224

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-10-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-10-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS